Abdulrehman, Yaasin Yusuf (CPSO#: 86460)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Y. Abdulrehman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 28 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: 205 Tawa Centre 3017 - 66 Street NW Edmonton, AB T6K 4B2
Date Received: 24 May 2017


Address: c/o Dr. Mary MacDonald Suite 200 1040 Oliver Road Thunder Bay ON P7B 7A5 Tel: 807-345-5056 Fax: 1-888-504-1696
Date Received: 12 Oct 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 30 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 21 Oct 2010 to 10 Nov 2010
Elective Trainee - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 02 May 2013 to 29 Jun 2013
Elective Trainee - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Nov 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017