Abe, Tomonobu (CPSO#: 73172)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Nagoya University School of Medicine, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2001
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2001
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2001