Abed, Mohammed Moghareh (CPSO#: 22414)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Tehran, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 02 Dec 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Apr 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Aug 2015