Abel, James Gordon (CPSO#: 52607)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 01 Nov 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 1986
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Nov 1995