Abelsohn, Alan Ralph (CPSO#: 29948)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Dec 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 04 Jun 2003

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
1466 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3S3
Phone: (416) 483-8111
Fax: (416) 483-8182
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alan Abelsohn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 16 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Abelsohn ( CPSO# 29948 )

Business Address:
Suite 205
1466 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3S3
Phone Number: (416) 483-8111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1978 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2003
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 15 Oct 2004
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Dec 2004
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 01 Dec 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 14 Oct 2009

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 14 Oct 2009 Active View Details [+]
            As from October 14, 2009, at 11:59 p.m., by order of the Discipline Committee
            of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the terms, conditions and
            limitations imposed on October 15, 2004 on the certificate of registration held
            by Dr. Alan Ralph Abelsohn are varied and the following terms, conditions and
            limitations are imposed:  

                  (a)    Dr. Abelsohn is to continue to report all K005 billings to the
                        College, and commence reporting any K007 billings to the College on
                        a monthly basis. With respect to billing codes K005 and K007, Dr.
                        Abelsohn shall maintain a separate log by patient name of all
                        services billed under these Codes, to be submitted to the College
                        within five days of the end of each month. Dr. Abelsohn may provide
                        family or marital therapy to patients, but may only provide such
                        treatment in the presence of two or more family members or
                        individuals;
                  
                  (b)   Dr. Abelsohn is to continue to co-operate with any medical
                        inspector that the College wishes to send who may conduct random
                        inspections of Dr. Abelsohn's OHIP billings and their supporting
                        clinical record entries for specified codes and periods subsequent
                        to the date of this Order of the inspector's choosing; 
                  
                  (c)   Dr. Abelsohn will forthwith execute a consent in the form attached
                        at Schedule "A" consenting to the release of his OHIP billing
                        information to the College;
                  
                  (d)   Dr. Abelsohn is to obtain a practice monitor acceptable to the
                        College to review any charts relating to individual psychotherapy
                        including, but not limited to, any patients for whom K007 code has
                        been billed, for a period of two years; and
                  
                  (e)   with respect to billing code K007, the maximum number of patient
                        visits that Dr. Abelsohn may have with any one patient is limited
                        to four and the maximum number of visits  per week for each patient
                        is one. Dr. Abelsohn may bill 2 unit sessions (totaling 46 minutes)
                        per patient, per week as long as the units are consecutive and the
                        maximum number of visits per week does not exceed one.

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 03 Aug 2004
Summary:

On August 3, 2004, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Abelsohn committed acts of 
professional misconduct in that he sexually abused a patient (touching and behaviour of a sexual 
nature), engaged in acts relevant to the practise of medicine that having regard to all the 
circumstances would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
unprofessional (various boundary violations).  In addition, the Committee found Dr. Abelsohn to 
be incompetent as defined in subsection 52(1) of the Code. 
 
On October 14, 2004, the Discipline Committee ordered the following: 
 
1.    The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to suspend Dr. Abelsohn s certificate of 
      registration for a period of twelve (12) months, to commence on December 1, 2004.   
 
2.    The  Discipline  Committee  directs  that  the  Registrar  impose  the  following  terms, 
      conditions and limitations on Dr. Abelsohn s certificate of registration for an indefinite 
      period of time: 
 
      (a)   Dr. Abelsohn must successfully complete a boundaries course acceptable to  the 
            College at his own expense before November 1, 2005;  
 
      (b)   Dr. Abelsohn is prohibited from providing individual psychotherapy to patients, 
            and from providing or billing for any service which should be billed under the 
            OHIP codes applicable to  individual psychotherapy, including K006 and K007. 
            With respect to billing code K005, Dr. Abelsohn shall maintain a separate log by 
            patient  name  of  all  services  billed  under  Code  K005,  to  be  submitted  to  the 
            Registrar within five days of the end of each month. Dr. Abelsohn may provide 
            family or marital therapy to patients, but may only provide such treatment in the 
            presence of two or more family members or individuals; 
 
      (c)   Dr.  Abelsohn  will  forthwith  execute  a  consent  in  the  form  attached  at 
            Schedule A  consenting  to  the  release  of  his  OHIP  billing  information  to  the 
            College; and 
 
      (d)   Dr. Abelsohn will co-operate with any medical inspector chosen by the College 
            who may conduct random inspections of Dr. Abelsohn s OHIP billings and their 
            supporting chart entries for specified codes and periods subsequent to the date of 
            this Order of the inspector s choosing. 
       
3.    The  Discipline  Committee  orders  Dr. Abelsohn  to  attend  before  the  panel to  be 
      reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the register. 
 
4.    The Discipline Committee further orders that this proceeding be included in the Register. 
       
       
                                           
                                           

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Dec 01, 2003