Abi-Jaoude, Elia (CPSO#: 80898)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French, Portuguese

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Psychiatry
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: 416-813-7529
Fax: 416-813-6565
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

UHN Toronto Western Hospital
TS Neurodevelopmental Clinic
399 Bathurst Street Room 3WW 402
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: (416) 603-5794
Fax: (416) 603-5182
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIA ABI-JAOUDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABI-JAOUDE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Sep 2014
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009