Abidi, Shuayb Mohammad (CPSO#: 90243)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jan 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jan 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dari, English, Farsi, Pushto, Urdu

Education:Kabul University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Milad Medical Center
8173 Yonge st
Thornhill ON  L3T 2C6
Phone: (289) 597-0244
Fax: (289) 597-0104
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

200 wellington street west
Barrie ON  L4N 1K9
Canada
Phone: (705) 739-0127
Fax: (705) 739-1008
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

716 The Queensway South
Keswick ON  L4P 4C9
Canada
Phone: 9055351397
Fax: 9055351459
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shuayb M. Abidi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 25 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Abidi ( CPSO# 90243 )

Business Address:
716 The Queensway South
Georgina ON  L4P 4C9
Phone Number: (905) 535-1397

Business Address:
8173 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L3T 2C6
Phone Number: (289) 597-0244

Business Address:
3 - 200 Wellington Street West
Barrie ON  L4N 1K9
Phone Number: (705) 739-1800

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHUAYB MOHAMMAD ABIDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABIDI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 09 Mar 2009 to 31 May 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Community Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jun 2009 to 07 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 08 Mar 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 08 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 09 May 2011 to 08 May 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 09 May 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Nov 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Mar 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2013