Abidullah, Mohammad (CPSO#: 85841)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Mar 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Mar 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Pushto, Urdu

Education:University of Peshawar, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brandon Regional Health Authority
Westman Regional Laboratory
150 McTavish Avenue East Rm L 108A
Brandon MB  R7A 7H8
Phone: (204) 578-4480
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Wheat City Medical Clinic
C1-1711 Kirckcaldy Drive, Brandon,
Manitoba
Brandon MB  R7A0B9
Canada
Phone: (204) 727-1711
Fax: (204) 727-1711
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 08 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD ABIDULLAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABIDULLAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2009