Abla, Oussama Amine (CPSO#: 69184)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Aug 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 30 Aug 2000

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Italian

Education:University of Genova, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Haematology/Oncology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7500 Ext. 207879
Fax: (416) 813-5327
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematology Effective: 30 Aug 2000 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 30 Aug 2000 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Aug 2000 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2000
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Aug 2001
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2003
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Sep 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Sep 2008
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 10 Sep 2008

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 10 Sep 2008 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Oussama Amine Abla may practise paediatric haematology/oncology only,
                  in  the  Department  of  Paediatrics  at  The Hospital for Sick Children,
                  University of Toronto.

            2.    The certificate of registration will automatically  expire  when Dr. Abla
                  no longer has an appointment at The Hospital for Sick Children.