Aborawi, Abdelbasat (CPSO#: 81186)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Oct 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Al-Arab Medical University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 23 Aug 2004
PEAP - Resident - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 24 Aug 2004 to 24 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 25 Aug 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Sep 2006 to 31 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Nov 2008 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2009