Abosoudah, Ibraheem Faisal Ibraheem (CPSO#: 76759)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009