Abou Nahia, Fouad Fawzy Ghanem Abdelsalam (CPSO#: 92127)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Nov 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Nov 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Aleppo, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 06 Nov 2009 to 25 Jan 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Jan 2010 to 30 Nov 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Jan 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2010