Abou Nassar, Bechara Karim (CPSO#: 53611)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:St. Joseph's University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 03 Dec 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 1983
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 25 Oct 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jul 2010