Abou Zahr, Labib (CPSO#: 61635)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 11 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:American University of Beirut, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 07 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 04 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 6 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 7 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 1997
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2006