Abouali, Jihad Alexander Karim (CPSO#: 87118)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 304
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone: (416) 546-7373
Fax: (416) 546-7111
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1971 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M4L 1H9
Canada
Phone: (416) 691-6661
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Abouali Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 18 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Abouali ( CPSO# 87118 )

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 461-8272

Business Address:
1971 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M4L 1H9
Phone Number: (416) 691-6661

Business Address:
840 Coxwell Avenue
Suite 304
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone Number: (416) 461-8272

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JIHAD ALEXANDER KARIM ABOUALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABOUALI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012