Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Aboulisayen, Abdullah Mohamed (CPSO#: 70791)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Sep 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Sep 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 357
1720 Howard Avenue East
Windsor ON  N8X 5A6
Phone: (519) 258-4900
Fax: (519) 258-4901
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abdullah Aboulisayen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 13 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Aboulisayen ( CPSO# 70791 )

Business Address:
Suite 357
1720 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 5A6
Phone Number: (519) 258-4900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABDULLAH MOHAMED ABOULISAYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABOULISAYEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jun 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2008