Abourbih, Jacques (CPSO#: 29692)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 11 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1977 to 31 Dec 1977
Resident 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1978 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 3 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 1977
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015