Abraham, Arun (CPSO#: 86017)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Jawaharlal Inst Postgraduate Med Educ, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 21 Mar 2007 to 20 Apr 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 21 Apr 2007 to 20 Mar 2008
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 21 Mar 2008 to 20 Mar 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 21 Mar 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2009