Abraham, Eapen George (CPSO#: 50045)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Aug 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Malayalam

Education:University of Bombay, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
115 MacLean Place
Welland ON  L3B 5X9
Phone: (905) 788-0960
Fax: (905) 788-9278
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. George Abraham Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Abraham ( CPSO# 50045 )

Business Address:
115 MacLean Place
Welland ON  L3B 5X9
Phone Number: (905) 788-0960

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EAPEN GEORGE ABRAHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABRAHAM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1984