Abraham, Gebrehiwot (CPSO#: 58710)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Aug 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Amharic, English, Eritrean

Education:Addis Ababa University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 Stokes Street
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 32254
Fax: (416) 979-6864
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

250 College street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Canada
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 32254
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gebrehiwot Abraham Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 18 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Abraham ( CPSO# 58710 )

Business Address:
100 Stokes Street
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Business Address:
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 11 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEBREHIWOT ABRAHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABRAHAM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1990