Abraham, Ruth Maria (CPSO#: 113799)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Sep 2017

Expiry Date:  17 Mar 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 18 Sep 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Windsor University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingsbridge Medical Centre
Suite 111
33 City Centre Drive
Mississauga ON  L5B 2N5
Phone: (905) 507-1111
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ruth Maria Abraham Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Abraham ( CPSO# 113799)

Business Address:
Kingsbridge Medical Centre
Suite 111
33 City Centre Drive
Mississauga ON  L5B 2N5
Phone Number: (905) 507-1111

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Sep 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Sep 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 17 Mar 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 18 Sep 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Ruth  Maria  Abraham  may  practise  family  medicine at Kingsbridge
                  Medical   Centre   in  Mississauga,  Ontario,  while  under   supervision
                  coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically  expires  eighteen  months
                  from the date of issuance.

            3.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events,  unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  supervisor  notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr.
                        Abraham's knowledge,  skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide
                        the required reports to  the  College  by  the  due  date or if the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Abraham's practice, or
                  
                  (iii) the College finds the assessment report, pertaining to  the on-site
                        assessment of Dr. Abrahram's practice unsatisfactory.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on September 18, 2017, and will expire  on  or
                  before March 17, 2019, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.