Abraham, Thoppil Mathew (CPSO#: 52322)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 15 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Malayalam

Education:University of Kerala, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Safestor Records Management 2704 Highway 20 Fonthill, ON L0S 1E6 Tel: (905) 892-0010
Date Received: 01 Feb 2011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 19 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 1993
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 15 Aug 2013