Previous Hearings
Committee: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal
Decision Date: 06 Dec 2021
Summary:
On May 20, 2021 allegations of professional misconduct against Dr. Abrahim were referred to the Discipline Committee of the College, now referred to as the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal.
The Notice of Hearing alleged Dr. Abrahim had engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct and that the governing body of a health profession in a jurisdiction other than Ontario found he committed an act of professional misconduct that would, in the opinion of the panel, be an act of professional misconduct under section 51 of the Health Professions Procedural Code or an act of professional misconduct as defined in the regulations.
The OPSDT heard the matter on December 6, 2021 by videoconference. Counsel for both the College and Dr. Abrahim attended the hearing.
On the basis of an Agreed Statement of Facts and Admission (Liability) and an Agreed Statement of Facts on Penalty, and after hearing submissions of both counsel, the OPSDT found Dr. Abrahim committed an act of professional misconduct in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional and that the governing body of a health profession in a jurisdiction other than Ontario found he committed an act of professional misconduct that would, in the opinion of the panel, be an act of professional misconduct under section 51 of the Health Professions Procedural Code or an act of professional misconduct as defined in the regulations.
Disposition
On December 6, 2021, the OPSDT issued its Order directing that:
• Dr. Abrahim attend before the panel to be reprimanded;
• The Registrar suspend Dr. Abrahim’s certificate of registration for two months commencing December 7, 2021;
• The Registrar place terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Abrahim ’s certificate of registration, as set out in the Order;
• Dr. Abrahim pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000 by January 6, 2022.
Dr. Abrahim waived his right to appeal the Tribunal’s decision and the panel delivered the reprimand at the conclusion of the hearing.
Release of reasons
The OPSDT released its reasons for its decision on January 7, 2022. A link to the reasons is below
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): 2021-12-06
Concerns
Source:
FSMB (USA)
Notice Type Discipline Findings in Other Jurisdictions
Active Date: December 03, 2018
Summary:
Where a disciplinary finding is made against a member on or after September 1, 2015 by a medical regulatory or licensing authority in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding to be posted on the register, if the finding is known to the College.
The following are non-Ontario disciplinary findings made against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:
_ _
On December 3, 2018, the New York State Board for Professional Medical Conduct accepted Dr. Ken Abrahim’s surrender of his physician license in the State of New York in lieu of pursuing allegations of professional misconduct against him. The Board also ordered that Dr. Abrahim’s name be stricken from the roster of physicians in the State of New York. The allegations of professional misconduct arise from the disciplinary action taken against Dr. Abrahim by the Florida Board of Medicine and from Dr. Abrahim’s failure to disclose the existence of the Florida Board complaint on his New York State licenser registration renewal form. The College was notified of this finding by a report received on December 5, 2018.
Source:
FSMB (USA)
Notice Type Discipline Findings in Other Jurisdictions
Active Date: July 25, 2018
Summary:
Where a disciplinary finding is made against a member on or after September 1, 2015 by a medical regulatory or licensing authority in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding to be posted on the register, if the finding is known to the College.
The following are non-Ontario disciplinary findings made against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:
_ _
On July 25, 2018, Dr. Ken Abrahim entered into a Consent Agreement with the North Carolina Medical Board (the “Board”) whereby the Board ordered a reprimand against Dr. Abrahim’s licence to practise medicine in North Carolina and a fine of $5000.00. Dr. Abrahim voluntarily entered into the Consent Agreement to resolve proceedings by the Board arising from Dr. Abrahim’s failure to disclose in his June 2017 annual Board registration that the Florida Board of Medicine had issued an administrative complaint against him in February 2017.
Source:
FSMB (USA)
Notice Type Discipline Findings in Other Jurisdictions
Active Date: March 13, 2018
Summary:
Where a disciplinary finding is made against a member on or after September 1, 2015 by a medical regulatory or licensing authority in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding to be posted on the register, if the finding is known to the College.
The following are non-Ontario disciplinary findings made against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:
_ _
On March 13, 2018, the Florida Board of Medicine approved and adopted a Settlement Agreement between Dr. Abrahim and the Florida Department of Health as an Order of the Board. The allegations against Dr. Abrahim included several counts of: failure to keep legible medical records that justify the course of treatment and committing medical malpractice by failing to meet the standard of care. The following penalties were imposed: a reprimand, an administrative fine of $35,000, a requirement to complete Board-approved laws and rules course and medical records course, a prohibition on prescribing certain controlled substances for the treatment of chronic non-malignant pain, and a prohibition against owning, operating or being employed by a pain management clinic. The College was notified of this finding by a report received on March 13, 2018.