Abram, Nancy Lynn (CPSO#: 60650)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
43 Victoria Terrace
Grimsby ON  L3M 2E9
Phone: (905) 536-5347
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nancy L. Abram Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 05 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Abram ( CPSO# 60650 )

Business Address:
43 Victoria Terrace
Grimsby ON  L3M 2E9
Phone Number: (905) 536-5347

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NANCY LYNN ABRAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABRAM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1990