Abrams, Jonathan C (CPSO#: 73772)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4th Floor
Box 13
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 6833
Fax: (416) 586-4804
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. C. Abrams Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 26 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Abrams ( CPSO# 73772 )

Business Address:
60 Murray Street
PO Box 13 - 4th Floor
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN C ABRAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABRAMS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2003