Abrams, Judith Ruth (CPSO#: 53644)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Sep 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
102 Upper Mountain Avenue
Montclair NJ  07042
United States
Phone: (973) 707-7481
Fax: (973) 707-7482

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Connecticut
USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 04 Dec 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUDITH RUTH ABRAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABRAMS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Dec 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1984