Abrams, Karen Michele (CPSO#: 59327)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
8 E N 212
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4825
Fax: (416) 340-4198
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karen M. Abrams Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Abrams ( CPSO# 59327 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
8 EN 212
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4825

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN MICHELE ABRAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABRAMS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1989