Abramson, Beth Lynn (CPSO#: 63897)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Division of Cardiology
30 Bond Street
Rm 6-039 Queen Central
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5968
Fax: (416) 864-5974
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Beth Abramson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 18 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Abramson ( CPSO# 63897 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Division of Cardiology
Room 6-039Q
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5424

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 26 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BETH LYNN ABRAMSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABRAMSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1992