Abrol, Kaajal (CPSO#: 82531)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Apr 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
11th Floor
655 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2K4
Phone: (416) 506-0804 Ext. 2328
Fax: (416) 217-3952
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

True North Imaging
7330 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 7Y7
Canada
Phone: (905) 707-1777
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kaajal Abrol Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Abrol ( CPSO# 82531 )

Business Address:
1800 - 655 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2K4
Phone Number: (416) 217-3951

Business Address:
True North Imaging
7330 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 7Y7
Phone Number: (905) 707-1777

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAAJAL ABROL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABROL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2012