Absalom, Marion Lynn (CPSO#: 61540)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Toronto General Hospital, 200 Elizabeth Street, Toronto, ON M5G 2C4
Date Received: 12 May 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

South Africa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016