Abu Harbesh, Saud Mohamed Saud (CPSO#: 68512)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Aug 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 18 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 15 Jun 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 15 Aug 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

McMaster University, 16 Aug 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 15 Aug 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

McMaster University, 16 Aug 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000