Abu Kuwaik, Ghassan Zohair Kamal (CPSO#: 81347)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Himachal Pradesh University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Second Floor, Unit 300
2389 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Bio Health Centre
Maple ON  L6A 3Z2
Phone: (416) 929-1919
Fax: (289)304-9644
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abu Kuwaik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Abu Kuwaik ( CPSO# 81347 )

Business Address:
2389 Major Mackenzie Drive West
2nd Floor, Unit 300
Maple ON  L6A 3Z2
Phone Number: (416) 929-1919

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GHASSAN ZOHAIR KAMAL ABU KUWAIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABU KUWAIK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 31 May 2004 to 28 Jul 2004
PEAP - Resident - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Oct 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2011