Abu Shullaih, Zaki Omar (CPSO#: 77394)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Institute of Medicine, Pharmacy,Iasi, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
Queen's University
70 Barrie Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Electoral District: 06

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 15 Apr 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 07 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 08 Sep 2004 to 07 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 08 Sep 2005 to 07 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 08 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007