Abu-Bakare, Asiru (CPSO#: 24311)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 May 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 May 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Port Arthur Health Centre Inc.
194 North Court Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4V7
Phone: (807) 346-1000
Fax: (807) 346-6206
Electoral District: 09
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Saint Joseph's Hospital Site
35 Algoma Street North
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5G6
Canada
Phone: (807) 343-2431
Fax: (807) 343-0144
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

Thunder Bay Regional
Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V7
Canada
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Fax: (807) 684-5890
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Asiru Abu-Bakare Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Abu-Bakare ( CPSO# 24311 )

Business Address:
Port Arthur Health Centre Inc
194 North Court Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4V7
Phone Number: (807) 346-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 10 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASIRU ABU-BAKARE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABU-BAKARE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Aug 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 1990