Abu-Hijleh, Tala Marwan (CPSO#: 108978)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 23 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:RCSI - Medical University of Bahrain, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Ottawa
451 Smyth Road, Room 2044
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M5
Phone: 613-798-5555 Ext. 13050
Electoral District: 07

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TALA MARWAN ABU-HIJLEH shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ABU-HIJLEH is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. ABU-HIJLEH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ABU-HIJLEH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ABU-HIJLEH shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ABU-HIJLEH is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ABU-HIJLEH no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 22 Sep 2016
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018