Abu-Khudair, Walid Abdul-Karim (CPSO#: 70841)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 29 Feb 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Feb 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 06 Sep 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Sep 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 06 Sep 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Sep 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 06 Sep 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Sep 1999 to 06 Sep 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Sep 2000 to 06 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Sep 2001 to 06 Sep 2002
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Sep 2002 to 06 Sep 2003
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Sep 2003 to 29 Feb 2004
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Feb 2004