Abunassar, Joseph George (CPSO#: 88435)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street, CV Lab
Kingston, Ontario
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-1383
Fax: 613-548-2400
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joseph Abunassar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Abunassar ( CPSO# 88435 )

Business Address:
CV Lab
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 02 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH GEORGE ABUNASSAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABUNASSAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2013