Abunassar, Ramzi Yussif (CPSO#: 26600)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jun 1974

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 10 Sep 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Hebrew

Education:University of Ottawa, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
324-1929 Russell Road
Ottawa ON  K1G 4G3
Phone: (613) 737-7726
Fax: (613) 737-2856
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 207-267 O'Connor Street
Ottawa Ontario
Ottawa ON  K2P 1V3
Canada
Phone: 613-567-8000
Fax: 613-567-8022
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ramzi Y. Abunassar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Abunassar ( CPSO# 26600 )

Business Address:
Suite 324
1929 Russell Road
Ottawa ON  K1G 4G3
Phone Number: (613) 737-7726

Business Address:
Suite 207
267 O'Connor Street
Ottawa ON  K2P 1V3
Phone Number: (613) 567-8000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Mar 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 10 Sep 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 10 Sep 2015 Active View Details [+]
            As from September 10, 2015, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Ramzi Yussif
            Abunassar, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Abunassar
            to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                    ("Undertaking")
                  
                                          of
                  
                              DR. RAMZI YUSSIF ABUNASSAR
                                    ("Dr. Abunassar")
                  
                                          to
                  
                        THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                    (the "College")
            ________________________________________________________________________

            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   I, Dr. Abunassar, certificate of registration number 26600, am a member
                  of the College.  The College has received information regarding my
                  standard of practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (2)   I, Dr. Abunassar, understand and agree that I am bound by the terms of
                  this Undertaking from the date on which I sign it.

            (3)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Abunassar, undertake that, effective immediately, I will
                        cease to perform colonoscopies. 
                  
            (4)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Abunassar, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise including, but not limited to,
                        hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within 15 days of
                        executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to
                        inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within 15
                        days of commencing practice at that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Abunassar, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and
                        not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice
                        Locations and patient charts by a College representative for the
                        purposes of monitoring my compliance with the terms of this
                        Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Abunassar, give my irrevocable consent to the College to
                        make appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan
                        and/or any person or institution that may have relevant
                        information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with
                        the terms of this Undertaking.
                  
            (5)   I, Dr. Abunassar, undertake to comply with the terms and conditions of
                  this Undertaking and acknowledge that a breach by me of any term of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College (the "Discipline Committee").

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (6)   I, Dr. Abunassar, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for
                  payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the terms of this Undertaking. 

            (7)   I, Dr. Abunassar, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand
                  the terms and conditions provided in this Undertaking and that I have
                  obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this
                  Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

            (8)   I, Dr. Abunassar, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes
                  terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for
                  the purposes of section 23 of the Health Professions Procedural Code,
                  which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O.
                  1991, c. 18, as amended. I understand that this Undertaking shall be
                  information on the College's Register that is available to the public
                  during the time period that the Undertaking remains in effect.

            D.    CONSENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Abunassar, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  this Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities approved by the College, at any hospital or Practice
                  Location where I practice or have privileges ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and
                  to provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has
                  that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or
                  any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.