Abuzallouf, Sadeq A M A (CPSO#: 70865)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 24 Sep 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Sep 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kuwait University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 24 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 24 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 25 Sep 2001 to 24 Sep 2002
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Sep 2002