Abuzeid, Wael (CPSO#: 88588)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cardiovascular lab, Kidd 3
Kingston Health Sciences Center
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-1383
Fax: 613-548-2400
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Wael Abuzeid Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 01 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Abuzeid ( CPSO# 88588 )

Business Address:
6 - 906 Sheppard Avenue West
North York ON  M3H 2T5
Phone Number: (416) 633-0045

Business Address:
Faculty of Medicine
Room 602
500 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7

Business Address:
A208 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5

Business Address:
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-3232

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 02 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WAEL ABUZEID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABUZEID is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012