Accardi, Sara Joanne (CPSO#: 106756)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Glengarry Memorial Hospital
20260 County Road 43
Alexandria ON  K0C 1A0
Phone: 613-525-5665
Fax: 613-525-5666
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARA JOANNE ACCARDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ACCARDI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 22 Sep 2015
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2017