Acharya, Meenaxi Surendra (CPSO#: 58658)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:Gujarat University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South Bank medical center
2430 Bank street
Ottawa
ON.K1V0T7
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone: 613-736-6946
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Main street, Box 40
Bay L'Argent
BayL'Argent NL  A0E1B0
Canada
Phone: 709-461-2308
Fax: 709-461-2415
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 07 Sep 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEENAXI SURENDRA ACHARYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ACHARYA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1990