Achiume, Jordan Kirkwood Mzoma (CPSO#: 21365)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Sep 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:University of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1968
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2014
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 15 Jan 2015
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 15 Feb 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Sep 2015

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 18 Dec 2014
Summary:

 On December 18, 2014, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Achiume committed an act of 
 professional misconduct, in that he engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the 
 practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded 
 by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. Achiume admitted to the 
 allegation.  
  
 On January 13, 2010, the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) issued a 
 decision regarding an investigation. The Committee concluded that it had “significant concerns 
 regarding Dr. Achiume’s record-keeping”. It ordered Dr. Achiume to complete a specified 
 continuing education or remediation program (SCERP) in medical record-keeping between June 
and December 2010.  
 
Letters from the College sent on November 15, 2013 and January 26, 2014, advised Dr. Achiume 
 that he had still not complied with the January 2010 SCERP order, and had not provided any 
 explanation for his failure to do so.  He was informed that the matter could result in a referral to 
 the Discipline Committee. 
  
 As of February 19, 2014, Dr. Achiume had not completed a medical record-keeping course 
 approved by the College.  Accordingly, the ICRC referred the matter to the Discipline 
 Committee.   
  
 As of the date of this hearing [December 18, 2014], Dr. Achiume has completed the in-class 
 portion of the medical record-keeping course.  He is scheduled to complete the practical 
 component of the course by January 30, 2015. 
  
 On March 4, 2014, terms and conditions requiring Dr. Achiume to obtain a clinical supervisor 
 were placed on his certificate of registration by order of the College’s Quality Assurance 
 Committee, which remains in effect until March 4, 2015, unless rescinded or varied by the 
 Quality Assurance Committee.   
  
 The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:  
 1. Dr. Achiume appear before the panel to be reprimanded.  
 2. the Registrar suspend Dr. Achiume’s certificate of registration commencing January 15, 2015, 
   until the later of:  
   (a) February 15, 2015; or 
   (b) until Dr. Achiume has provided to the College proof of his compliance with the Specified 
      Continuing Education and Remediation Program in medical record-keeping directed by 
      the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in its January 13, 2010 decision. 
 3. Dr. Achiume pay costs to the College in the amount of $4,460, pursuant to a payment plan, 
   which requires Dr. Achiume to pay $371.67 per month, commencing February 1, 2015, until 
   the full amount is paid in full.  
  

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): December 18, 2014


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 25 Mar 1993
Summary:

 In March 1993, Dr. Achiume pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 
 27(26) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he made improper use of the authority to 
 prescribe, sell or dispense a drug, including falsifying a record in respect of a prescription or 
 the sale of a drug.  The Discipline Committee accepted this plea, and found Dr. Achiume guilty of 
 professional misconduct.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Achiume's licence to 
 practice be suspended for a period of six months, commencing on 1 August 1993.  The Committee 
 further ruled, however, that the final three months of this suspension would themselves be 
 suspended if the Doctor enrolled in and successfully completed a remedial course on prescribing; 
 if this course were completed by 31 October 1993; and if Dr. Achiume provided the College with 
 proof that he had enrolled in and successfully completed the required course.  Additional 
 allegations of professional misconduct and of incompetence were adjourned sine die  by the 
 Committee on the condition that the matter would only be brought back in the event of a further 
 complaint of sexual impropriety from someone other than the present complainant, and that Dr. 
 Achiume waive his right to complain about any delay from this point forward, in the event that the 
 matter was brought on again by the Committee.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 25 Mar 1993


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 04 Oct 1990
Summary:

 In October 1990, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Achiume guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in s. 27(29) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he committed sexual 
 impropriety with a patient.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Achiume be reprimanded, 
 with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register, and that the Doctor's licence to 
 practice medicine be suspended for a period of four months.

Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 19 Oct 1992
Hearing Date(s): 18 Jul 1990

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: September 30, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
("Undertaking")
of
DR. JORDAN KIRKWOOD MZOMA ACHIUME
("Dr. Achiume")
to
COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")


A. PREAMBLE

(1) I, Dr. Achiume, certificate of registration number 21365, am a member of the College.
The College has received information regarding my standard of practice.

(2) I, Dr. Achiume, acknowledge and agree that the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports
Committee ("Committee") referred allegations of professional misconduct and
incompetence to the Discipline Committee in a Notice of Hearing dated June 3, 2015 (the
"Notice of Hearing") attached hereto as Appendix A.

(3) I, Dr. Achiume, acknowledge and agree that the Committee determined that my practice
exposes or is likely to expose my patients to harm or injury and imposed interim terms,
conditions and limitations upon my certificate of registration by way of Order dated June
30, 2015 attached hereto as Appendix B.

(4) I, Dr. Achiume, acknowledge and agree that, in exchange for an original copy of this
Undertaking as executed by me, the College has agreed to withdraw the Notice of
Hearing.

B. UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT

(5) I, Dr. Achiume, hereby resign from the College effective September 30, 2015 (the
"Effective Date").

(6) I, Dr. Achiume, undertake that until the Effective Date I must not practice until I have
obtained a clinical supervisor ("Clinical Supervisor") who is acceptable to the College,
who has signed an undertaking in the form attached hereto as Appendix C. The Clinical
Supervisor shall be the Most Responsible Physician (MRP), as that term is defined in the
Guidelines for College-Directed Supervision, for all patients cared for, and must be
physically present in the room with myself at all times while I am engaged in patient care
and/or treatment.

(7) I, Dr. Achiume, undertake that I shall post the sign attached in Appendix D in a
prominent location in my waiting room and each of my examination rooms and shall not
have any in-person professional encounters with patients until the signs have been posted.

(8) I, Dr. Achiume, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical Supervisor as set out in
(6) above, I must cease practising medicine immediately until such time I have obtained a
Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.

(9) I, Dr. Achiume, hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician
to practise medicine in Ontario after the Effective Date.

(10) I, Dr. Achiume, hereby undertake that up until the Effective Date, I shall inform the
College of each and every location where I practise including, but not limited to,
hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice
Location(s)"), within 15 days of the date of this Undertaking. Going forward, I shall
inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within 15 days of commencing
practice at that location.

(11) I, Dr. Achiume, hereby provide the College with my irrevocable consent to make
appropriate inquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan in order for the College to
monitor my compliance with the terms of this Undertaking, and consent to the disclosure
by my Clinical Supervisor and/or any person or institution who may have relevant
information to the College of all information necessary to fulfill the Clinical Supervisor's
undertaking and to monitor my compliance with this Undertaking.

(12) I, Dr. Achiume, hereby undertake to submit to and not interfere with unannounced
inspections of my office(s), practice(s) and patient charts by a College representative for
the purposes of monitoring his compliance with the terms of this Undertaking.

(13) I, Dr. Achiume, agree that in the event that the College should become aware that I am in
breach of this Undertaking the College shall, in its sole discretion, have the right to
proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach of this undertaking and
shall have the right to proceed with the specified allegations set out in the Notice of
Hearing.

(14) I, Dr. Achiume, hereby agree to bear the risk of any prejudice that the passage of time
might cause to my ability to make full answer and defence, and waive the right to seek
any remedy on the basis of the passage of time, should the College proceed with any
allegations that may arise as a result of a breach of this Undertaking and/or pursuant to
paragraph (13 ) above.

(15) I, Dr. Achiume, undertake to the College to abide by the terms of the College's Policy on
Practice Management Considerations for Physicians Who Cease to Practise, Take an
Extended Leave of Absence or Close Their Practice Due to Relocation, a copy of which
is attached hereto as Appendix E.

(16) I, Dr. Achiume, undertake to the College that upon signing this Undertaking, I shall
forward a request to the General Manager of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan ("OHIP")
that my billing number be deactivated for services rendered after the Effective Date.

(17) I, Dr. Achiume, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees,
costs, charges, expenses, etc., if any, arising from the implementation of any of the terms
of this Undertaking.

(18) I, Dr. Achiume, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the terms and
conditions provided in this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(19) I, Dr. Achiume, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries
of OHIP and/or any person or institution who may have relevant information, in order for
the College to monitor my compliance with the terms of this Undertaking.

(20) I, Dr. Achiume, consent to the terms of this undertaking being entered on the register as
information that is available to the public.