Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Achong, Michael Reginald (CPSO#: 27282)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 May 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 May 1975

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Healthcare-Hamilton
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 929 - 42
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael R. Achong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 25 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Achong ( CPSO# 27282 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Healthcare-Hamilton
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto, ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1 800 775 0093 www.recordregistry.ca
Date Received: 22 Dec 2015

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 29 Mar 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL REGINALD ACHONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ACHONG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 1975