Achong-Low, Kongshiek Anthony (CPSO#: 31302)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 27 Oct 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 10 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 1980
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 18 Nov 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 1983
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 27 Oct 1994