Achtman, Daniel Seth (CPSO#: 52411)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011