Ackerman, Margaret Joan (CPSO#: 30800)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Health Records Hamilton Health Sciences 555 Sanatorium Rd, Hamilton, ON L9C 0C4
Date Received: 19 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 19 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: December 23, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On December 23, 2016, Hamilton Health Sciences notified the College that Dr. Margaret Ackerman voluntarily ceased to exercise her privileges as emergency room physician at Hamilton Health Sciences.