Adachi, Jonathan Derrick Jun (CPSO#: 50049)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Feb 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
25 Charlton Avenue East
Suite 501
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone: (905) 529-1317
Fax: (905) 521-1297
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adachi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Adachi ( CPSO# 50049 )

Business Address:
501 - 25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone Number: (905) 529-1317

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 05 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN DERRICK JUN ADACHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADACHI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 1984