Adam, David Neal (CPSO#: 78455)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Sep 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Sep 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite G-02
95 Bayly St. West
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone: (905) 427-3996
Fax: (905) 619-0438
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond St.
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Canada
Phone: (416) 360-4000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID NEAL ADAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 26 Aug 2002 to 22 Sep 2002
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 16 Dec 2002 to 12 Jan 2003
Elective Trainee - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 05 May 2003 to 01 Jun 2003
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Jun 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jan 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 May 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2007