Adam, George (CPSO#: 59936)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:University of Ottawa, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4801 Veterans Drive
St. Cloud MN  56303
United States
Phone: (320) 252-1670

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Minnesota

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 22 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGE ADAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADAM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1989